Financial history ZOHRA FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1143979
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £166.11k £288.15k £408.02k £504.70k £516.85k
Total expenditure £164.00k £285.05k £404.58k £502.97k £500.40k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £166.47k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £504.70k £516.85k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £499.64k £0
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £3.34k £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £500.40k