Financial history THE BIG HEART CHARITY FUND

Charity number: 1143256
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 10/05/2017 10/05/2018 10/05/2019 10/05/2020 10/05/2021
Total gross income £7.64k £1.04k £5.01k £20 £3
Total expenditure £4.26k £1.14k £2.58k £1.10k £1.59k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A