Accounts and annual returns MONOS

Charity Number: 1144096
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 May 2024 27 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 May 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2023 28 November 2024 242 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 28 November 2024 242 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2022 31 August 2023 153 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022

(These accounts
have been qualified)

31 August 2023 153 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2021 03 April 2022 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 03 April 2022 3 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2020 15 August 2021 137 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 15 August 2021 137 days late Download Open in new window