Financial history SOMALI RELIEF AND DEVELOPMENT ORGANISATION

Charity number: 1143898
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £9.66k £9.45k £11.20k £9.22k £7.07k
Total expenditure £3.00k £3.30k £4.00k £3.10k £1.63k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A