THE KENSINGTON TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1143301
Charity reporting is up to date (6 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £18.00k £32.94k £43.88k £10.00k £20.00k
Total expenditure £14.00k £16.39k £37.57k £18.50k £20.10k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £13.90k £13.54k N/A N/A N/A