JAFFNA MUSLIM ASSOCIATION - UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our main aim to uplift the living standards of the community by providing better Education, Self employment for poor families and widows and Funding for serious medical emergency. We are planning to do more for re-settling our very people by providing clean water , sanitation and other urgent requirement. Meanwhile arrange gatherings and other activities to unite our people in UK.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Leicester City
- Luton
- Slough
- Throughout London
- Sri Lanka
Governance
- 22 July 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
mohamed abdul cader shameez | Trustee | 19 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
JAEEROS AZANKUTHOOS | Trustee | 17 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
SHAWJEER SALMAN | Trustee | 17 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMED IMRAN MOHAMED JUNOOB | Trustee | 17 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
RAMEEZ ANES | Trustee | 22 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
MUTHU MOHAMED GIAS | Trustee | 14 July 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.25k | £35.85k | £44.30k | £35.52k | £36.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.68k | £23.87k | £27.67k | £33.21k | £25.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 13 May 2024 | 103 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25/06/2011
Charitable objects
(1) TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND TO PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH AMONG THE POOR, UNDERPRIVILEGED, REFUGEES AND PEOPLE IN NEED BY MEANS OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THE PROVISION OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF SERVICES, FACILITIES, EQUIPMENT, CLINICS, MEDICINES OR GRANTS FOR MEDICAL DIAGNOSIS AND TREATMENT, AND PROVISION OF HEALTH EDUCATION; (2) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE POOR, THE UNDERPRIVILEGED, REFUGEES AND PEOPLE IN NEED BY MEANS OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL PROGRAMMES, SUCH AS COMMUNITY LEARNING PROGRAMMES, TUITION CLASSES, AND THE PROVISION OR THE ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL FACILITIES, SUCH AS SCHOOLS, LIBRARIES AND TRAINING CENTRES; (3) TO RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, DISTRESS AND SUFFERING AMONG POOR PEOPLE, WIDOWS, ORPHANS, REFUGEES, VICTIMS OF NATURAL DISASTERS AND OTHER PEOPLE IN NEED, BY MEANS OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, MAKING GRANTS FOR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, EQUIPMENT, SERVICES AND FACILITIES, INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF FOOD, WATER, CLOTHING, MEDICAL TREATMENT, REHABILITATION, AND ACCOMMODATION FOR THE SAID PERSONS; (4) TO ADVANCE THE RELIGION OF ISLAM, BY MEANS OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, PROMOTING THE TEACHINGS AND TENETS OF ISLAM, PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR WORSHIP, PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR ISLAMIC EDUCATION AND PROVISION OF MARRIAGE AND BURIAL SERVICES, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TEACHINGS OF THE QURÔÇÖAAN AND THE PROPHET MUHAMMAD (PBUH); (5) TO HELP YOUNG PEOPLE, ESPECIALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH LEISURE TIME AND RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES, SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR CAPABILITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND AS GOOD CITIZENS; (6) TO PROMOTE ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THOSE IN NEED THAT THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
CAPITAL OFFICE
124 City Road
LONDON
EC1V 2NX
- Phone:
- 07861391459
- Email:
- jmauk@ymail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window