UNITED AGAINST POVERTY
Charity Number: 1143778
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
- The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
Governance
Registration history:
- 13 September 2011: Standard registration
- 17 December 2013: Removed (Does not operate)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
No other names
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
No financial information provided for the past 5 financial periods
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 07 June 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 07 June 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 07 June 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 07 June 2012 | Not submitted |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 08/06/2011
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN THE INDIA, PAKISTAN AND AFRICA:- A)TO RELIEVE SICKNESS BY THE PROVISION OF MEDICAL SERVICES. B)THE RELIEF OF POVERTY BY THE PROVISION OF (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) FOOD, SHELTER AND CLOTHING.
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window