PONTYPRIDD YOUNG MEN'S CHRISTIAN ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Pontypridd YMCA is a community building at the heart of Pontypridd town centre. We provide services and activities that enhance individuals health and wellbeing.Working with a number of voluntary, community and public sector organisations we offer youth activities, exercise and fitness, support, education and training.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
Total income:
£1,999,869
Donations and legacies | £2.00m | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£26,204
Raising funds | £3.45k | |
Charitable activities | £22.75k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £250,000 from 1 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £3.45k | |
Charitable expenditure | £22.75k | |
Retained for future use | £1.97m |
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Rhondda Cynon Taff
Governance
- 17 August 2011: Standard registration
- 17 January 2013: Funds received from 250530 YOUNG MEN'S CHRISTIAN ASSOCIATION, PONTYPRIDD BRAN...
- PONTYPRIDD YMCA (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alan Howard White | Trustee | 06 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Lawrence Carter | Trustee | 20 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sian Humphreys | Trustee | 09 June 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £81.71k | £32.59k | £448.36k | £2.01m | £2.00m | |
|
Total expenditure | £55.47k | £49.82k | £148.63k | £56.27k | £26.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £5.98k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £309.00k | £897.00k | £250.00k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £2.01m | £2.00m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £55.07k | £22.75k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.20k | £3.45k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £2.95k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | £3.02m | £5.27m | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | £586.22k | £288.29k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £202.02k | £179.25k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 90 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 90 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 456 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 456 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 20 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 23 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 01 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 08/07/2011 INCORPORATED 08/07/2011
Charitable objects
5. THE OBJECTS OF THE ASSOCIATION ARISE FROM ITS ACCEPTANCE OF THE PARIS BASIS OF 1855 INCORPORATED INTO THE NATIONAL STATEMENT OF THE AIMS AND PURPOSES OF THE YMCA IN ENGLAND, ADOPTED AT THE NATIONAL ASSEMBLY OF THE ENGLISH YOUNG MEN’S CHRISTIAN ASSOCIATIONS IN THE YEAR 2003, NAMELY: “THE YMCA IS A CHRISTIAN MOVEMENT WHICH SEEKS TO UNITE THOSE WHO, REGARDING JESUS CHRIST AS THEIR GOD AND SAVIOUR ACCORDING TO THE HOLY SCRIPTURES, DESIRE TO BE HIS DISCIPLES IN THEIR FAITH AND IN THEIR LIFE, AND TO ASSOCIATE THEIR EFFORTS FOR THE EXTENSION OF HIS KINGDOM. IT WELCOMES INTO ITS FELLOWSHIP PERSONS OF ALL RELIGIOUS FAITHS AND OF NONE. IN ACCORDANCE WITH ITS CHRISTIAN VALUES THE YMCA STANDS FOR: • A WORLDWIDE FELLOWSHIP BASED ON THE EQUAL VALUE OF ALL PERSONS; • RESPECT AND FREEDOM FOR ALL, TOLERANCE AND UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN PEOPLE OF DIFFERENT OPINIONS; • ACTIVE CONCERN FOR THE NEEDS OF THE COMMUNITY; AND • UNITED EFFORT BY CHRISTIANS OF DIFFERENT TRADITIONS. AS THE EXPRESSION OF ITS CHRISTIAN PURPOSES THE YMCA AIMS TO: • PROVIDE A WELCOME TO ITS MEMBERS FOR THEMSELVES IN A MEETING PLACE WHICH IS THEIRS TO SHARE, WHERE FRIENDSHIPS CAN BE MADE AND COUNSEL SOUGHT; • DEVELOP ACTIVITIES WHICH STIMULATE AND CHALLENGE MEMBERS IN AN ENVIRONMENT THAT ENABLES THEM TO TAKE RESPONSIBILITY TO FIND A SENSE OF ACHIEVEMENT; • INVOLVE ALL MEMBERS IN THE CARE AND WORK FOR OTHERS; AND • CREATE OPPORTUNITIES FOR EXCHANGING VIEWS SO THAT MEMBERS CAN IMPROVE THEIR UNDERSTANDING OF THE WORLD, OF THEMSELVES AND OF ONE ANOTHER.” ACCORDINGLY THE OBJECTS OF THE ASSOCIATION ARE: 1. TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR MEN AND WOMEN WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. 2. TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION FOR PERSONS OF ALL AGES WITH THE OBJECT OF DEVELOPING THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL OR SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES. 3. TO RELIEVE OR ASSIST IN THE RELIEF OF PERSONS OF ALL AGES WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY REASON OF THEIR SOCIAL, PHYSICAL OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES. 4. TO PROVIDE RESIDENTIAL ACCOMMODATION FOR PERSONS OF ALL AGES WHO ARE IN NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY REASON OF THEIR SOCIAL, PHYSICAL OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o JR House D6
Main Avenue
Treforest Industrial Estate
RCT
CF37 5UR
- Phone:
- 01443490390
- Email:
- admin@pontypriddymca.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window