Accounts and annual returns LAW FOR LIFE: THE FOUNDATION FOR PUBLIC LEGAL EDUCATION

Charity number: 1143589
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2023 10 April 2024 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023

(These accounts
have been qualified)

10 April 2024 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 07 February 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 07 February 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 16 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 16 March 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 20 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 20 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 29 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 29 August 2019 On time Download Open in new window