Accounts and annual returns PERSONAL BEST SOCCER

Charity number: 1144330
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021 04 April 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021

(These accounts
have been qualified)

04 April 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 21 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 21 April 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2019 20 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 20 April 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2018 25 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 25 April 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2017 24 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

24 April 2018 On time Download Open in new window