Financial history PERSONAL BEST SOCCER

Charity number: 1144330
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £46.96k £41.93k £47.64k £36.53k £39.81k
Total expenditure £46.30k £40.50k £43.23k £36.64k £27.45k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A