INTERNATIONAL PORTER PROTECTION GROUP (IPPG) UK

Charity number: 1143221
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £8.84k £12.67k £20.16k £14.65k £1.59k
Total expenditure £7.30k £14.74k £12.71k £9.96k £2.60k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A