THE DAWAH CENTRE ST ALBANS

Charity number: 1143882
Charity reporting is overdue by 1589 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 14 July 2020 Overdue Overdue by 128 days
Accounts and TAR 14 July 2020 Overdue Overdue by 128 days
Annual return 14 July 2019 Overdue Overdue by 493 days
Accounts and TAR 14 July 2019 Overdue Overdue by 493 days
Annual return 14 July 2018 Overdue Overdue by 859 days
Accounts and TAR 14 July 2018 Overdue Overdue by 859 days
Annual return 14 July 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1224 days
Accounts and TAR 14 July 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1224 days
Annual return 14 July 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1589 days
Accounts and TAR 14 July 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1589 days