Accounts and annual returns PHAB FRENDZ

Charity number: 1143439
Charity reporting is overdue by 1571 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 110 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 110 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 475 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 475 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 841 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 841 days
Annual return 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1206 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1206 days
Annual return 31 March 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1571 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1571 days