Accounts and annual returns BIRMINGHAM PHAB CAMPS

Charity number: 502073
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2021 23 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 23 May 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2020 11 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 11 May 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2019 03 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 03 March 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2018 09 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 09 May 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2017 15 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 15 May 2018 On time Download Open in new window