Trustees BIRMINGHAM PHAB CAMPS

Charity number: 502073
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Andrew Thomas Miles Chair 01 April 2022
None on record
Emma Louise Spittle Trustee 11 January 2022
None on record
Jacqueline Redding Trustee 09 April 2019
HOME-START BIRMINGHAM-NORTH WEST
Received: On time
JENNIFER HARDY Trustee 09 January 2018
None on record
Grant McCaig Trustee 13 October 2015
None on record
ANTHONY RATE Trustee
None on record