Accounts and annual returns THE ARCHERY FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1143875
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 March 2022 19 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 26 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 02 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 20 November 2019 113 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 02 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required