Financial history 4 THE YOUTH LTD

Charity number: 1144413
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £107.01k £106.08k £176.66k £178.92k £217.40k
Total expenditure £82.21k £103.00k £169.76k £227.43k £193.55k
Income from government contracts £25.00k £26.33k £80.38k £70.70k £84.47k
Income from government grants N/A £7.39k £39.97k £39.76k £21.74k