COMMUNITY CHOICE WESTMINSTER
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Welfare Rights Information, Advice and advocacy services Outreach Work to people who have no access to information Referrals to housing option, job centres, social services, GPs, and NHS walk in health check services Monthly Workshops with speakers: for young and older people in w/minster to highlights health issues, homelessness, unemployed, welfare benefits, teenage pregnancy etc
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- City Of Westminster
Governance
- 11 October 2011: Standard registration
- 25 November 2019: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2012 | 30/06/2013 | 30/06/2014 | 30/06/2015 | 30/06/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.04k | £0 | £0 | £240 | £600 | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.99k | £100 | £0 | £200 | £400 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2016 | 10 August 2017 | 102 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2016 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20/12/2010 AS AMENDED ON 20/07/2011
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN LONDON BOROUGH OF WESTMINSTER AND SURROUNDING AREA BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY; (1) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE, INFORMATION, SUPPORT, TRANSLATING AND INTERPRETING SERVICES IN MATTERS SUCH AS WELFARE BENEFITS HEALTH, HOUSING, EMPLOYMENT AND EDUCATION. (2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN PARTICULAR THE PROVISION OF LANGUAGE AND OTHER SUBJECT CLASSES. (3) TO PROTECT AND PRESERVE HEALTH. (4) TO PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE BENEFICIAL AREA IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window