Financial history THE SAINT PAUL'S TRUST OF PENZANCE

Charity number: 1143691
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £321.68k £0 £0 £0 £12.28k
Total expenditure £1.41k £5.41k £10.96k £86.26k £86.88k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A