BLACKPOOL ICE DROME CHARITIES ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1143903
Charity reporting is up to date (8 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Lisa Ellen Caunce Trustee 21 April 2018 None on record
Annette Christine Wrigley Trustee 21 April 2018 None on record
Wayne Ashton Trustee 05 April 2014 None on record
Joanne Walsh Trustee 18 May 2019 None on record
Brenda Green Trustee 18 May 2019 None on record
Sarah Louise Holyhead Trustee 18 May 2019 None on record
Sarah Ellen Innes Trustee 24 April 2017 None on record
KERRY ASHTON Chair 22 September 2011 None on record
Anthony Swarbrick Trustee 24 April 2017 None on record
Anna-Louise Sarah Williams Trustee 19 May 2015 None on record
Clare Davies Trustee 24 April 2017 None on record