THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JOHN THE EVANGELIST, FAREHAM

Charity number: 1143777
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 24 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 24 September 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 29 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 29 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 31 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 31 July 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 20 April 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

20 April 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 16 May 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 21 May 2016 On time Download