LEICESTER ASSOCIATION FOR SPINA BIFIDA AND HYDROCEPHALUS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE CHARITY EXISTS TO SUPPORT INDIVIDUALS AND FAMILIES WITH SPINA BIFIDA AND HYDROCEPHALUS. THE TRUSTEES MEET ONCE A MONTH FOR 10 MONTHS OF THE YEAR TO DISCUSS THE DAY TO DAY RUNNING OF THE CHARITY. REQUESTS FOR FINANCIAL HELP WOULD BE DISCUSSED AT THIS MEETING. SOCIAL EVENTS ARE ORGANISED AND A HOLIDAY CHALET IS MAINTAINED FOR THE USE OF THE MEMBERS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2021
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Leicester City
- Leicestershire
- Rutland
Governance
- 19 February 1973: Standard registration
- L A S B A H (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Pauline Uliasz | Chair | 11 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
RUTH DODDS | Trustee | 10 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
MARY JEAN TICKNER | Trustee | 12 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
MARIE LYNDA NEWTON | Trustee | 10 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
LYNDA NEWTON | Trustee | 10 March 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2017 | 31/01/2018 | 31/01/2019 | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.28k | £6.76k | £6.91k | £6.98k | £3.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.95k | £7.67k | £8.04k | £7.30k | £6.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 180 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 180 days | |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 546 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 546 days | |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 911 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 911 days | |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 30 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 30 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 25 APRIL 1970 AS AMENDED 16 OCTOBER 2001
Charitable objects
THE ASSOCIATION IS ESTABLISHED FOR THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO HAVE SPINA BIFIDA AND/OR HYDROCEPHALUS OR ALLIED OR RELATED DISORDERS WHO ARE RESIDENT IN THE BENEFICIAL AREA BY PROVIDING SUPPORT FOR THEIR CARE WELFARE TREATMENT EDUCATION AND INTEGRATION INTO SOCIETY, IRRESPECTIVE OF RACE, CREED, COLOUR OR SEXUAL ORIENTATION
Area of benefit
LEICESTER, LEICESTERSHIRE AND RUTLAND
Contact information
- Address:
-
19 Hinckley Road
Leicester Forest East
LEICESTER
LE3 3GL
- Phone:
- 07772220563
- Email:
- lasbah@aol.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window