Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST LEONARD, HYTHE

Charity number: 1144695
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
John Charles Wren Chair 19 March 2020
ROTARY CLUB OF HYTHE KENT TRUST FUND
Received: On time
David Lionel Godwin Owen Trustee 05 May 2022
ANNE PEIRSON CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
ST SAVIOURS MEDICAL CHARITY
Received: On time
THE WAKEFIELD BEQUEST
Received: On time
BRINLEY HUGHES Trustee 05 May 2022
THE FRIENDS OF ST LEONARD'S CHURCH, HYTHE
Received: On time
PENELOPE JANE MATTOCKS Trustee 05 May 2022
None on record
ROGER HUGH TAYLOR Trustee 05 May 2022
None on record
HELEN FLORENCE WAYMOUTH Trustee 05 May 2022
None on record
MARY ELIZABETH TYLER Trustee 03 May 2022
None on record
Rev Michael David William Darkins Trustee 03 March 2022
ANNE PEIRSON CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
HOSPITALS OF ST BARTHOLOMEW AND ST JOHN
Received: On time
MARILYN HAZEL ANNE JOHNSON Trustee 28 March 2019
None on record
GILLIAN JOYCE COX Trustee 17 March 2016
None on record
BERKELEY HILL Trustee 16 November 2011
HYTHE BAY CHILDREN'S CENTRE
Received: On time
MICHAEL ANTHONY COX Trustee 10 November 2011
None on record