Accounts and annual returns EL-KWABOAT MINISTRIES

Charity number: 1143434
Charity reporting is overdue by 27 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 27 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 27 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 10 March 2023 38 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 10 March 2023 38 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 18 March 2022 46 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 18 March 2022 46 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 31 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required