REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD DIVINE COVENANT CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provison of church service in Nottingham
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 18 August 2011: Standard registration
- RCCG DIVINE COVENANT CENTRE (Working name)
- REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD: DIVINE COVENANT CENTRE (Previous name)
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Ayanate Alalibo Ephraim | Trustee | 09 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
PASTOR RASAQ ADIO IBRAHIM | Trustee | 09 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr Adetutu Omosola Emmanuel | Trustee | 09 June 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £60.43k | £68.50k | £77.66k | £99.75k | £130.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £45.49k | £53.20k | £61.90k | £70.14k | £115.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 01 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 01 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 12 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 12 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 10 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 10 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 10 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 10 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 25 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 25 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 24/07/2011
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH WORLDWIDE THE RELIEF OF POVERTY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Dcc House Alpine Street
Basford
Nottingham
NG6 0HS
- Phone:
- 01246520308
- Email:
- poe@dcchouse.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window