FALMOUTH & EXETER STUDENTS' UNION

Charity number: 1145405
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021
Total gross income £1.20m £1.30m £1.35m £1.31m £1.02m
Total expenditure £1.16m £1.25m £1.29m £1.25m £981.45k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £753.03k £849.30k £934.05k £1.02m £909.16k
Income - Other trading activities £43.18k £46.19k £15.40k £17.24k £4.50k
Income - Charitable activities £393.16k £398.28k £399.96k £270.27k £103.39k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £9.91k £5.07k £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £300 £0 £600 £400
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.15m £1.23m £1.27m £1.22m £963.63k
Expenditure - Raising funds £12.17k £19.78k £23.17k £27.32k £17.82k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £130.57k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0