FALMOUTH & EXETER STUDENTS' UNION

Charity number: 1145405
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ellie May Ricks Trustee 03 November 2020 None on record
Kevin Ivor Werry Trustee 27 May 2020
MEVAGISSEY AND DISTRICT MUSEUM Recently registered
MEVAGISSEY AND DISTRICT MUSEUM SOCIETY Received: On time
Fatuma Abdi Mohamud Trustee 03 November 2020
RALEIGH INTERNATIONAL TRUST Received: On time
Amelia Georgina Sturrock Banton Trustee 26 June 2020 None on record
Paul Kenneth Thomas Northmore Trustee 01 August 2016
FALMOUTH & EXETER STUDENTS' UNION Recently registered
Frank Oliver Gough Trustee 03 November 2020 None on record
Sajjad Hossain Trustee 04 December 2020 None on record
Charlotte Jane Agnew Trustee 26 June 2020 None on record
Rosie Ann Hunnam Trustee 21 June 2019
FALMOUTH & EXETER STUDENTS' UNION Recently registered
Elizabeth Marie Marshall Trustee 26 June 2020 None on record
Julian Paul Waring Trustee 27 May 2020 None on record
Cara Chittenden Chair 26 June 2020 None on record