INTERNATIONAL GOSPEL OF TRUTH CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
HOLDING REGULAR WORSHIP SERVICES TO PROMOTE THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF SPIRITUAL ENRICHMNET THROUGH PRACTICING THE PRINCIPLES OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
- Ghana
Governance
- 23 August 2011: Standard registration
- IGOTC (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JENNIFER QUAYE | Trustee | 12 August 2019 |
|
|||||
VICTORIA BADOE | Trustee | 12 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rev SYLVESTER OPOKU MANU | Trustee | 19 May 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £249.93k | £272.74k | £279.97k | £318.93k | £275.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £232.91k | £319.10k | £249.52k | £244.65k | £286.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 26 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 26 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 10 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 10 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 12 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 12 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 19 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 19 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 14 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 14 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 29/07/2011
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE ORGANISATION'S ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC: TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH [IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS] IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT;
Contact information
- Address:
-
LENWOOD HALL
CORONATION ROAD
LONDON
E13 9QB
- Phone:
- 07713106488
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window