ACCESS PLYMOUTH LIMITED

Charity number: 1143569
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 13 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 13 April 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 26 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 26 February 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 29 July 2019 90 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 29 July 2019 90 days late Download
Annual return 30 June 2017 09 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 22 March 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2016 11 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 25 January 2017 On time Download