AMY WINEHOUSE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1143740
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MICHAEL WINEHOUSE Trustee 20 May 2020 None on record
JONATHAN SIMPSON Trustee 12 September 2014
CAMDEN ARTS CENTRE Received: On time
JANIS WINEHOUSE Trustee 09 September 2011 None on record
Melissa Rice Trustee 22 September 2020 None on record
PROFESSOR STEPHEN LEE Trustee 21 May 2018 None on record
BARRY YIN Trustee 17 July 2017 None on record
MITCHELL WINEHOUSE Trustee 09 September 2011 None on record
Yogesh Dewan Trustee 01 September 2017 None on record
RICHARD COLLINS Trustee 23 April 2012 None on record
JANE WINEHOUSE Trustee 23 April 2012 None on record