BORDER CITY LODGE OF FREEMASONS NO 2906 BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 502113
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £2.07k £1.63k £758 £647 £917
Total expenditure £6.76k £344 £200 £0 £500
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A