YOU RAISE ME UP LIMITED

Charity number: 1147534
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £48.95k £100.31k £142.52k £147.42k £214.27k
Total expenditure £43.88k £72.18k £128.95k £169.99k £181.89k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £35.21k