THE ABBEYFIELD SOUTHPORT SOCIETY LIMITED

Charity number: 502123
Charity reporting is overdue by 173 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 Overdue Overdue by 173 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Overdue Overdue by 173 days
Annual return 30 September 2019 21 January 2021 175 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 24 December 2019 147 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 28 March 2019 241 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 28 March 2019 241 days late Download
Annual return 30 September 2016 15 November 2018 473 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 15 November 2018 473 days late Download