THE ABBEYFIELD SOUTHPORT SOCIETY LIMITED

Charity number: 502123
Charity reporting is overdue by 171 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2015 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019
Total gross income £226.28k £218.16k £110.22k £0 £0
Total expenditure £246.95k £276.83k £168.42k £0 £0
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A