Trustees TICKHILL PARISH ROOM

Charity number: 1144276
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rosemary Ann Chappell Chair 14 October 2011
None on record
Elaine Cookson Trustee 14 June 2023
None on record
Anthony Terence Sheridan Trustee 14 June 2023
TICKHILL COUNTRYSIDE GROUP
Overdue by 22 days
Elizabeth Pickering Trustee 14 June 2023
TICKHILL COMMUNITY LIBRARY
Overdue by 22 days
Rev'd Canon Paul Richardson Trustee 11 May 2022
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF TICKHILL SAINT MARY WITH STAINTON SAINT WINIFRID
Received: 24 days late
TICKHILL UNITED CHARITY
Received: On time
Timothy Damian Edwin Sweed Trustee 30 June 2021
None on record
Peter Ian Walker Trustee 20 June 2021
THE DONCASTER CIVIC TRUST
Received: On time
Eluned Eleanor Foulds Trustee 11 May 2016
None on record
Kathleen Mason Trustee 13 April 2016
None on record
LUCILLE ALICE HENDERSON Trustee 09 April 2014
None on record
Ann Lesley Lockett Trustee 14 October 2011
None on record
Noreen Luker Sweed Trustee 14 October 2011
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF TICKHILL SAINT MARY WITH STAINTON SAINT WINIFRID
Received: 24 days late