Trustees MAIDENHEAD & DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL
Charity number: 1144774
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Karen Hope | Chair | 12 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Terence Charles Jones | Trustee | 13 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Loz Daniel Marchant | Trustee | 12 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
ERICA DIANE HUNTER | Trustee | 12 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Robert Steven Harris | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Alan Graham Abrahamson | Trustee | 12 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
William Carter | Trustee | 12 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Ian Stephen Anderson | Trustee | 24 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
SIMON DEREK WHEELER | Trustee | 15 November 2011 |
|
|||||
Gillian May Hill | Trustee | 15 November 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.