HAMPTON-IN-ARDEN SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote high standards of planning and architecture in the Civic Parish of Hampton in Arden and its surroundings. To educate the public in the geography, history, natural history and architecture of the area. To secure the preservation, protection, development and improvement of features of historic or public interest in the area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Solihull
Governance
- 22 January 1973: Standard registration
- Hampton-In-Arden Society (Residents' Association) (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lesley Anne Cable | Chair | 03 November 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Karen Wood | Trustee | 09 November 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Stuart Mair | Trustee | 09 November 2023 |
|
|
||||||
John Robert Gillies-Wilkes | Trustee | 04 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Jonathan Daines | Trustee | 03 November 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Sarah Alison White | Trustee | 03 November 2021 |
|
|||||||
Kathleen Horsburgh | Trustee | 03 November 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Geoffrey Raymond Arthur | Trustee | 08 January 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Janet Hilton | Trustee | 15 November 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Carol Ann Grant | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.67k | £1.78k | £1.81k | £2.90k | £2.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.13k | £1.56k | £633 | £2.34k | £1.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 06 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 30 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 04 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 09 November 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 29TH NOVEMBER 1972 AS AMENDED 3 NOVEMBER 1999 as amended on 16 Sep 2020
Charitable objects
(i) To promote high standards of planning, development and architecture in or affecting the area of benefit. (ii) To inform and advise residents and the public generally in the geography, natural history, environment, ecology, architecture and history of the area of benefit. (iii) To secure the preservation, protection, development and improvement of features in general public amenity or historic or public interest in the area of benefit. (iv) To liaise and cooperate with other community bodies to advance the objectives of the Society.
Area of benefit
THE AREA COMPRISING THE CIVIL PARISH OF HAMPTON-IN-ARDEN
Contact information
- Address:
-
66 Old Station Road
Hampton-In-Arden
SOLIHULL
West Midlands
B92 0EY
- Phone:
- 07775691712
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window