Gateway Waterside

Charity number: 1143971
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £80.94k £67.55k £61.59k £51.88k £70.64k
Total expenditure £91.59k £60.50k £57.12k £33.85k £69.70k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A