Gateway Waterside

Charity number: 1143971

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Sharon Mellings Chair 09 January 2018 None on record
Nathan Alan Hussey Trustee 18 January 2021 None on record
DAVID GEORGE NORBURY Trustee 13 March 2018
THE CROSSINGS Received: On time
Kathryn Mary Holmes Trustee 15 November 2021 None on record
Anthony Richard Hodder Trustee 03 July 2019 None on record
Andrew Graham Clarke Trustee 03 July 2019 None on record