CATERPILLAR PRE-SCHOOL OF BATTLE BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of the education and spiritual development of children below compulsory school age and the provision of facilities for recreation of such children, in the interest of social welfare and with the object of improving their conditions of life, by providing for all children without discrimination a safe and satisfying pre-school where Christian beliefs and values are upheld.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £89,835 from 2 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- East Sussex
Governance
- 27 January 2012: Standard registration
- BATTLE BAPTIST CATERPILLAR PRE-SCHOOL (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Penelope Hamilton | Chair | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ed Jones | Trustee | 25 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
GLENYS CORNWELL | Trustee | 25 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
JOHN SOUTHAM | Trustee | 27 January 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £84.48k | £80.21k | £90.99k | £126.68k | £118.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £94.44k | £85.01k | £85.31k | £118.74k | £131.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £60.79k | £60.55k | £70.40k | £92.75k | £89.84k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 20 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 20 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 20 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 20 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 26 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 30 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 12 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 12 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 22 October 2020 | 114 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 22 October 2020 | 114 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 04/07/2011 AS AMENDED ON 02/11/2011
Charitable objects
2.1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING THE SPIRITUAL DEVELOPMENT) OF CHILDREN BELOW COMPULSORY SCHOOL AGE, AND 2.2 THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION FOR SUCH CHILDREN IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE BY: PROVIDING FOR ALL CHILDREN WITHOUT DISCRIMINATION A SAFE AND SATISFYING PRE-SCHOOL WITH A CHRISTIAN ENVIRONMENT WHERE CHRISTIAN BELIEFS AND VALUES ARE PROMOTED AND UPHELD. THIS WILL BE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE MISSION OF THE CHURCH WHICH SEEKS TO PROVIDE SERVICES TO THE COMMUNITY AND TO PROMOTE CHRISTIANITY WITHIN IT. THE INCOME AND (AT THE DISCRETION OF THE MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE) THE CAPITAL OF THE GROUP SHALL BE APPLIED SOLELY IN FURTHERING THESE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
BAPTIST CHURCH
MOUNT STREET
BATTLE
EAST SUSSEX
TN33 0EG
- Phone:
- 01424774825
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window