Accounts and annual returns MAKE A MOVE

Charity number: 1143982
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2021 18 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 18 May 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 18 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 18 March 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 20 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 20 May 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2018 31 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 31 May 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2017 31 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 31 May 2018 On time Download Open in new window