Financial history MAKE A MOVE

Charity number: 1143982
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021
Total gross income £130.93k £130.49k £118.59k £145.76k £99.68k
Total expenditure £131.79k £129.39k £142.12k £107.08k £103.48k
Income from government contracts £4.57k £15.00k N/A £19.95k N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £8.60k £50.94k