British quality care foundation

Charity number: 1144322
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

General charitable purposes, Housing, skill development and Employment support, Education and Training, Relief of poverty, Health improvement

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2023

Total income: £55,000
Total expenditure: £54,320

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
  • Accommodation/housing
  • Religious Activities
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Essex
  • Kingston Upon Hull City
  • Thurrock
  • Throughout London

Governance

Registration history:
  • 18 October 2011: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • BQCF (Working name)
  • Heartstart Foundation (Working name)
  • Lifeline Housing (Working name)
  • International Association of Private School Proprietors (Previous name)
  • International Association of Proprietors of Private Schools (IAPPS) (Previous name)
  • ZION FAITH MISSION (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ehizokhale Anegbe Chair 01 November 2022
None on record
Stephen Olabode Trustee 01 October 2023
None on record
Promise Agbi Trustee 15 January 2023
None on record
Rev Assurance Idenekpoma Trustee 01 March 2022
None on record
Onyekachukwu Gabriel Enuezie Trustee 01 April 2020
None on record
DIANA NERLINGER Trustee 18 October 2011
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023
Total gross income £61.35k £53.78k £48.00k £15.50k £55.00k
Total expenditure £61.28k £52.90k £47.50k £14.35k £54.32k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2023 15 April 2024 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 15 April 2024 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 03 May 2023 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 29 April 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 29 April 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 12 May 2021 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 12 May 2021 12 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2019 14 May 2020 14 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 29 August 2020 121 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
CEME Campus
Marsh Way
Rainham
Rainham
RM13 8EU
Phone:
+443300245953
Email:
info@bqcf.org
Website:

No information available