R3 CYMRU: RESETTLE, RECOVER, RESKILL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Monmouthshire
Governance
- 17 October 2011: Standard registration
- 01 May 2014: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- R3 (Working name)
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2012 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 27/09/2011
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE COMPANY ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO ASSIST CURRENT OR FORMER MEMBERS OF THE ARMED FORCES AND OTHERS AFFLICTED BY CONFLICT AND THEIR DEPENDANTS BY: (A) PROMOTING AND PROTECTING THE MENTAL AND PHYSICAL HEALTH OF THOSE THAT ARE SERVING OR HAVE SERVED IN THE ARMED FORES AND OTHERS AFFECTED BY CONFLICT (PARTICULARLY THOSE SUFFERING FROM POST-COMBAT STRESS DISORDER) THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES, EQUIPMENT OR SERVICES FOR THEIR REHABILITATION; (B) ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF THOSE THAT ARE SERVING OR HAVE SERVED IN THE ARMED FORCES AND OTHERS AFFECTED BY CONFLICT SO AS TO ENABLE THEM TO BE ABLE TO COPE WITH THEIR RETURN TO CIVILIAN LIFE AND NON-COMBAT SITUATIONS; AND (C) ADVANCING SUCH OTHER EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window