Financial history THE INSTITUTE FOR OUTDOOR LEARNING

Charity number: 1149420
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022
Total gross income £291.96k £349.67k £240.26k £226.33k £255.71k
Total expenditure £315.03k £364.48k £224.19k £184.74k £238.29k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A