NORTHAMPTONSHIRE MUSIC AND PERFORMING ARTS TRUST

Charity number: 1145643
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 13 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 13 May 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 28 August 2020 59 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 28 August 2020 59 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 27 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 27 February 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 26 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 26 February 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 23 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 12 April 2017 On time Download