NORTHAMPTONSHIRE MUSIC AND PERFORMING ARTS TRUST

Charity number: 1145643
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Alison Frazer Mitchell Eastwood Trustee 23 September 2021 None on record
MORCEA Antoinette WALKER Trustee 18 July 2019 None on record
JAMIE CLARKE Trustee 20 September 2018 None on record
Roger Benjamin Lloyd Griffiths Trustee 14 July 2016 None on record
Iain Christopher Massey Trustee 13 July 2017 None on record
Georgie Fordham Trustee 20 September 2018 None on record
Trevor Francis Shipman Trustee 19 January 2017 None on record
DUDLEY HUGHES Trustee 18 May 2017
HIGHAM FERRERS CHICHELE EDUCATION FOUNDATION Received: On time
Clive Richard Gresham Trustee 19 January 2017 None on record
JOAN KIRKBRIDE Chair 13 July 2017
THE NENE VALLEY CARE TRUST Received: On time
RENUKA POPAT Trustee 13 July 2017 None on record