Accounts and annual returns CRE8 MACCLESFIELD LIMITED

Charity number: 1147150
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2022 15 June 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 15 June 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 08 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 08 June 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 24 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 24 May 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 30 September 2020 92 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 30 September 2020 92 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2018 03 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 03 June 2019 On time Download Open in new window