Trustees CRE8 MACCLESFIELD LIMITED

Charity number: 1147150
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jenni Hardy Chair 30 November 2015
None on record
Laura Rhona Rowansey Mummery Trustee 18 July 2022
None on record
Jared Brown Trustee 17 May 2021
None on record
Peter Munro Trustee 17 May 2021
None on record
Adam Small Trustee 26 November 2017
None on record
James Booth Trustee 19 October 2017
None on record
Dr RUTH THOMPSON Trustee 23 March 2015
MANCHESTER LOCAL MEDICAL COMMITTEE COMPASSIONATE FUND
Received: On time
AMEERA Fletcher Trustee 08 February 2013
None on record